SPRINGER v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: R.J. SPRINGER
Defendant: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00783
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Peter J Phipps
Referring Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management set for 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/7/2019. Stipulation due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 8/30/2019. (av)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan for all further proceedings. Judge Peter J. Phipps no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 08/07/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary W. Baun on behalf of R.J. SPRINGER. (Baun, Gary)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by R.J. SPRINGER. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Ferris, Devon)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Gary Wm. Baun to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Gary Wm. Baun to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5212325) by R.J. SPRINGER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Baun, Gary)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF COURT. By July 30, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R.J. SPRINGER. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Devon F. Ferris on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Ferris, Devon)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Watson, Dennis)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (av)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5195130), filed by R.J. SPRINGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPRINGER v. CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. SPRINGER
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: Gary W. Baun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Devon F. Ferris
Represented By: Dennis A Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?