FLICKINGER v. THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: JENNA FLICKINGER
Defendant: SHAFT DRILLERS INTERNATIONAL, LLC and THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00787
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Answer due from All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Henefer, E.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Henefer, E.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Thomas Henefer on behalf of THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Henefer, E.)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBITS 1 in Support of #1 Complaint, by JENNA FLICKINGER. (Killion, Katie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SHAFT DRILLERS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Marino, Robert)
August 2, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2019. (nll)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Marino on behalf of SHAFT DRILLERS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Marino, Robert)
July 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Text in entry incorrect. CORRECTION: Court changed to correct dates. This message is for informational purposes only. (nll)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JENNA FLICKINGER. SHAFT DRILLERS INTERNATIONAL, LLC waiver sent on 7/02/2019, answer due 8/31/2019. (Killion, Katie) Modified text on 7/29/2019 to update answer deadline. (nll)
July 23, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA on 8/31/2019 (nll)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JENNA FLICKINGER. THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA waiver sent on 7/02/2019, answer due 8/31/2019. (Killion, Katie) Modified text on 7/23/2019 to updates deadlines. (nll)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Petrunya on behalf of JENNA FLICKINGER. (Petrunya, Max)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHAFT DRILLERS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5195980), filed by JENNA FLICKINGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLICKINGER v. THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAFT DRILLERS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: E. Thomas Henefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNA FLICKINGER
Represented By: Katie A. Killion
Represented By: Max Petrunya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?