COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. v. 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
Plaintiff: COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.
Defendant: 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00793
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC. (jv)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. for entry of DEFAULT against 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC. . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service) (Manne, Beverly)
August 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.. 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Manne, Beverly)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine E. Koop Irwin on behalf of COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. (Koop Irwin, Katherine)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Burne on behalf of COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. (Burne, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
July 5, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Local Rule 7.1 Certificate. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Removed from public view and re-docketed as #4 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
July 4, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. (jv)
July 4, 2019 Filing 3 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. (Manne, Beverly) Modified text on 7/5/2019. (jv)
July 3, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/10/2019. (av)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC. (av)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5196716), filed by COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC. v. 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2SQ INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMERCIAL CREDIT GROUP INC.
Represented By: Beverly Weiss Manne
Represented By: Katherine E. Koop Irwin
Represented By: Matthew J. Burne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?