GOODWIN v. ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff: DURRAN GOODWIN
Defendant: ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00795
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Notice of Appearance, #12 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Documents are duplicates. CORRECTION: Duplicate document No. 12 terminated. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M. Kolman on behalf of DURRAN GOODWIN. (Kolman, Timothy) Document removed from public view because it is a duplicate of #10 . Modified text on 8/29/2019. (ept)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (W. Charles Sipio) by DURRAN GOODWIN. (Kolman, Timothy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M. Kolman on behalf of DURRAN GOODWIN. (Kolman, Timothy)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue. Case Management Conference set for 8/29/19 is now RESCHEDULED to 10/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/8/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Young, David)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/31/19. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/31/19. (jhi)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC. (Young, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by DURRAN GOODWIN. ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Sipio, W.)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/8/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC (mao)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5197781), filed by DURRAN GOODWIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOODWIN v. ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED OILFIELD SERVICES LLC
Represented By: David A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DURRAN GOODWIN
Represented By: W. Charles Sipio
Represented By: Timothy M. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?