BURNSWORTH v. NORTHERN CLEARING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BRYAN BURNSWORTH
Defendant: DENNIS BERGMAN and NORTHERN CLEARING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00796
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DENNIS BERGMAN, NORTHERN CLEARING, INC.. (Fellows, Sunshine)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by BRYAN BURNSWORTH. (Sansone, Joel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: A Telephone Conference was held on 8/5/2019. Defendants intend to vigorously defend the case and are not interested in any early resolution. (Court Reporter: none) (jmb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of BRYAN BURNSWORTH. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that, at the request of counsel, the time of the Telephone Conference for August 5, 2019 has been changed. Originally set for August 5, 2019 at 10:00 AM, the Telephone Conference has been rescheduled for August 5, 2019 at 1:30 PM. The information regarding the call in number remains the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/25/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DENNIS BERGMAN, NORTHERN CLEARING, INC.. (Fellows, Sunshine)
July 22, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/29/2019. (mao)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than August 9, 2019. The applicable form is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie K. Goldin on behalf of DENNIS BERGMAN, NORTHERN CLEARING, INC.. (Goldin, Stephanie)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Avrum Levicoff on behalf of DENNIS BERGMAN, NORTHERN CLEARING, INC.. (Levicoff, Avrum)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 The Court asked if defendants were interested in settlement talks either with or without the Court prior to engaging in Rule 26 efforts and discovery. Counsel will talk with their respective clients and also with each other to determine if an early resolution is a possibility. A second status call is set for August 5 at 10:00 AM. Same dial in numbers as today's call. (Court Reporter: none) (jmb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of BRYAN BURNSWORTH. (Terzigni, Massimo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sunshine R. Fellows on behalf of DENNIS BERGMAN. (Fellows, Sunshine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sunshine R. Fellows on behalf of NORTHERN CLEARING, INC.. (Fellows, Sunshine)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that a telephone status conference is scheduled for July 18, 2019 at 2:00 PM. Counsel are to call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. Plaintiff's counsel shall forward a copy of this order to defense counsel forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/15/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/05/2019. (jmb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DENNIS BERGMAN, NORTHERN CLEARING, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5197878), filed by BRYAN BURNSWORTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURNSWORTH v. NORTHERN CLEARING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN BURNSWORTH
Represented By: Joel S. Sansone
Represented By: Massimo A. Terzigni
Represented By: Elizabeth Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS BERGMAN
Represented By: Stephanie K. Goldin
Represented By: Sunshine R. Fellows
Represented By: Avrum Levicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN CLEARING, INC.
Represented By: Stephanie K. Goldin
Represented By: Sunshine R. Fellows
Represented By: Avrum Levicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?