BLAN v. CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY M. BLAN
Defendant: JAMES SHENTON, CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC and JAMES SHENTO
Case Number: 2:2019cv00807
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. The Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 10/3/19 is hereby rescheduled for 10/10/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/22/19. (jms)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference by CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC, JAMES SHENTO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Kurt)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management set for 10/3/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jgb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC, JAMES SHENTO. (Miller, Kurt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC, JAMES SHENTO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Miller, Kurt)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY M. BLAN. JAMES SHENTO served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Feinstein, Edward)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY M. BLAN. CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Feinstein, Edward)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/11/2019. (jgb)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Wittlinger on behalf of ANTHONY M. BLAN. (Wittlinger, Emily)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruairi McDonnell on behalf of ANTHONY M. BLAN. (McDonnell, Ruairi)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Rabenold on behalf of ANTHONY M. BLAN. (Rabenold, Elizabeth)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC, JAMES SHENTON (nll)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC, JAMES SHENTON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5201371), filed by ANTHONY M. BLAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Classic Limousine Transportation, #3 Summons James Shento) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLAN v. CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES SHENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLASSIC LIMOUSINE TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Represented By: Kurt A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES SHENTO
Represented By: Kurt A. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY M. BLAN
Represented By: Edward J. Feinstein
Represented By: Elizabeth Rabenold
Represented By: Ruairi McDonnell
Represented By: Emily Wittlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?