MULLEN v. G6 HOSPITALITY LLC et al
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Defendant: BRE/EVERBRIGHT M6 LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY PROPERTY LLC, MOTEL 6 OPERATING, L.P., G6 HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY REAL ESTATE LLC and G6 HOSPITALITY LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00809
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 10/09/19. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/30/19. (eca)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by G6 HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY PROPERTY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY REAL ESTATE LLC, MOTEL 6 OPERATING, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Fritz, Kevin)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF COURT. By September 12, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William S. Stickman for all further proceedings. Judge Peter J. Phipps no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 08/26/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Kevin A. Fritz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 07/30/19. (eca)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Minh N. Vu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 07/30/19. (eca)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Kevin A. Fritz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5227650) by G6 HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY PROPERTY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY REAL ESTATE LLC, MOTEL 6 OPERATING, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Fritz, Kevin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Minh N. Vu to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5227623) by G6 HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY PROPERTY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY REAL ESTATE LLC, MOTEL 6 OPERATING, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Vu, Minh)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPROVING #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant BRE/Everbright M6 LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 07/23/19. (eca)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant BRE/Everbright M6 LLC Only by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR (Carlson, R.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. BRE/EVERBRIGHT M6 LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; G6 HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; G6 HOSPITALITY LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; G6 HOSPITALITY PROPERTY LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; G6 HOSPITALITY REAL ESTATE LLC waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; MOTEL 6 OPERATING, L.P. waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Carlson, R.)
July 12, 2019 Judge Peter J. Phipps added as presiding. (cjo)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk is directed to reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/10/19. (njt)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BRE/EVERBRIGHT M6 LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY PROPERTY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY REAL ESTATE LLC, MOTEL 6 OPERATING, L.P. (jd)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRE/EVERBRIGHT M6 LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY PROPERTY LLC, G6 HOSPITALITY REAL ESTATE LLC, MOTEL 6 OPERATING, L.P. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5201535), filed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MULLEN v. G6 HOSPITALITY LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE/EVERBRIGHT M6 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 HOSPITALITY PROPERTY LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Fritz
Represented By: Minh N. Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTEL 6 OPERATING, L.P.
Represented By: Kevin A. Fritz
Represented By: Minh N. Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Fritz
Represented By: Minh N. Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 HOSPITALITY REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Fritz
Represented By: Minh N. Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G6 HOSPITALITY LLC
Represented By: Kevin A. Fritz
Represented By: Minh N. Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?