BETRAS v. BGC 135 9TH STREET, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DEANNA BETRAS
Defendant: ALBERT BORTZ and BGC 135 9TH STREET, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00811
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by DEANNA BETRAS. BGC 135 9TH STREET, INC. served on 8/17/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Cordes, Samuel)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Albert Bortz on July 16, 2019, filed by DEANNA BETRAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Cordes, Samuel)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 07/10/2019. (jmb)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BGC 135 9TH STREET, INC., ALBERT BORTZ (jjg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BGC 135 9TH STREET, INC., ALBERT BORTZ (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5202483), filed by DEANNA BETRAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BETRAS v. BGC 135 9TH STREET, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERT BORTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BGC 135 9TH STREET, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANNA BETRAS
Represented By: Samuel J. Cordes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?