WILLIAMS v. ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC
Plaintiff: MONIQUE WILLIAMS
Defendant: ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00818
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall mark Attorney W. Charles Sipio's appearance withdrawn. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/4/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (smc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (W. Charles Sipio) by MONIQUE WILLIAMS. (Sipio, W.)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M. Kolman on behalf of MONIQUE WILLIAMS. (Kolman, Timothy)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendant's time to file an Answer has been extended nunc pro tunc from 8/6/2019 to 8/7/2019. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/20/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (smc)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/20/2019. (smc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC. (Baillie, Karen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order) (Baillie, Karen)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MONIQUE WILLIAMS. ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Sipio, W.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC. (Baillie, Karen)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC. (Baillie, Karen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC (nll)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5203906), filed by MONIQUE WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBURY HEIGHTS OF UPMC
Represented By: Karen Baillie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIQUE WILLIAMS
Represented By: W. Charles Sipio
Represented By: Timothy M. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?