BICK v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: RANDY BICK
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00821
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RANDY BICK. (Tarasuk, Ivan)
September 1, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RANDY BICK. (Tarasuk, Ivan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 9/3/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/5/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff shall file a Response to the motion by 9/3/2019. Defendant shall file a Reply by 9/17/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/5/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conferring, #2 Proposed Order) (Martini, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Miller on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Miller, Jennifer)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Martini on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by RANDY BICK. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Tarasuk, Ivan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/11/2019. (sms)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (jjg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 3015-5204592), filed by RANDY BICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BICK v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Mark A. Martini
Represented By: Jennifer L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY BICK
Represented By: Jeffrey Greyber
Represented By: Ivan J. Tarasuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?