UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $9,350.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $9,350.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY and esq anthony hugh rodriques
Case Number: 2:2019cv00830
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Verified Statement by anthony hugh rodriques (Rodriques, Anthony)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration of Publication filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA posted on Internet Site: forfeiture.gov for at least 30 days beginning on 07/24/19. (Lew, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT for Arrest in Action in Rem issued (mao)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Lew, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/15/19. (jad)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $9,350.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $9,350.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,350.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: esq anthony hugh rodriques
Represented By: Anthony Rodriques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?