DAVIS v. TRG CUSTOMER SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: APRIL DAVIS
Defendant: IBEX GLOBAL SOLUTIONS PLC and TRG CUSTOMER SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00831
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Julia W. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Julia W. Clark, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5250887) by APRIL DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A) (Clark, Julia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by APRIL DAVIS. IBEX GLOBAL SOLUTIONS PLC waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019; TRG CUSTOMER SOLUTIONS, INC. waiver sent on 7/15/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Karpf, Ari)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/15/2019. (sms)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to IBEX GLOBAL SOLUTIONS PLC, TRG CUSTOMER SOLUTIONS, INC. (nll)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against IBEX GLOBAL SOLUTIONS PLC, TRG CUSTOMER SOLUTIONS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5207737), filed by APRIL DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. TRG CUSTOMER SOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBEX GLOBAL SOLUTIONS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRG CUSTOMER SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL DAVIS
Represented By: Ari R. Karpf
Represented By: Julia W Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?