MARCUS v. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JUDITH MARCUS
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and AETNA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00835
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving #7 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AETNA, INC. AETNA, INC. terminated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/5/2019. (sms)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Aetna, Inc. by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AETNA, INC.. (Downey, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Mullen on behalf of AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mullen, Kathleen)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying Aetna, Inc.; CVS Pharmacy; CVS Health Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Downey, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Downey, Brian)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Downey on behalf of AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Downey, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/15/2019. (sms)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AETNA, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5208193), filed by JUDITH MARCUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARCUS v. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Brian P. Downey
Represented By: Kathleen A. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDITH MARCUS
Represented By: Stephen C. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?