UNITED STATES et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: OLSEN WOODWORK CO. and UNITED STATES
Defendant: CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC. and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00836
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay and Enforce Arbitration Rights, or Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss filed by OLSEN WOODWORK CO.. (Morris, Jeffrey)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay and Enforce Arbitration Rights, or Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gaetani, Michael)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gaetani, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Response re #10 Motion to Stay/Dismiss. Any party wishing to respond to the Motion must do so by 9/9/19. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (see http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), and no briefing schedule will issue. If all parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 8/29/19. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/19/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Gaetani on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gaetani, Michael)
August 13, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/20/2019. (ept)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gaetani, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against OLSEN WOODWORK CO. and UNITED STATES by CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Sarosiek, Tara)
August 8, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Stay and Enforce Arbitration Rights, or Alternatively MOTION to Dismiss filed by CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Sarosiek, Tara)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay and Enforce Arbitration Rights, or Alternatively, MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subcontract of Carothers Construction, Inc., #2 Exhibit Secretary of State Information for Olsen Woodwork, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Ben Logan, #4 Certification, #5 Proposed Order) (Sarosiek, Tara)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Sarosiek, Tara)
August 2, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 MOTION for attorney Tara S. Sarosiek to Appear Pro Hac Vice . ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2019. (mao) Modified text on 8/7/2019. (mao)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Tara S. Sarosiek, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #6 MOTION for attorney Tara S. Sarosiek to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5227469) by CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC. Affiant: Tara S. Sarosiek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Sarosiek, Tara )
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Tara S. Sarosiek to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5227469) by CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Sarosiek, Tara )
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by OLSEN WOODWORK CO.. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Morris, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by OLSEN WOODWORK CO.. CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Morris, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/15/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC., LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (mao)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC., LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5208285), filed by UNITED STATES, OLSEN WOODWORK CO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Carothers, #4 Summons - Liberty Mutual) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: Tara S. Sarosiek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael P. Gaetani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLSEN WOODWORK CO.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?