LEWIS v. UPMC MCKEESPORT HOSPITAL
Plaintiff: TRACY L. LEWIS
Defendant: UPMC MCKEESPORT HOSPITAL
Case Number: 2:2019cv00850
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UPMC MCKEESPORT HOSPITAL, filed by TRACY L. LEWIS. (cel)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Court has examined and considered the Complaint in this case. It is devoid of any factual allegations that could or would support any claim for relief. Notwithstanding the Plaintiff's pro se status, the Plaintiff is required to at least set forth facts which could support a claim for relief. Therefore, the Complaint in this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint on or before August 20, 2019 that sets forth sufficient facts to state a claim for relief. Should the Plaintiff fail to do so by that date, this dismissal will be converted automatically without further notice or order to a dismissal with prejudice. The Clerk will close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/30/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/25/19. (jad)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against UPMC MCKEESPORT HOSPITAL (IFP Granted) filed by TRACY L. LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/22/19. (bdb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TRACY L. LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. UPMC MCKEESPORT HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC MCKEESPORT HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY L. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?