LEWANDOWSKI v. FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.
Plaintiff: GAYLE LEWANDOWSKI
Defendant: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00858
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Art Stroyd is appointed as mediator. Mediation shall be concluded before November 12, 2019, unless extended by order of the Court. Bruce Carlson is designated as lead counsel and shall be responsible for working with the parties and the Mediator to coordinate an agreeable date, time and location for the initial Mediation. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/12/19. (rtw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER IMPLEMENTING FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d) Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/12/19. (rtw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR CLASS ACTION: Class certification Discovery due by 2/21/2020. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 9/27/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 10/11/2019. Plaintiff Expert Reports as to class certification due by 3/13/2020; Defendant Expert Reports as to class certification due by 4/13/2020; Expert Depositions as to class certification to be completed by 5/11/2020. Plaintiff's Motion for class certification due by 7/2/2020; Response to Motion due by 8/2/2020; Reply brief due by 8/22/2020. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/12/19. (rtw)
September 12, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/12/2019. Appearing for Plaintiff: Bruce Carlson. Appearing for Defendant: Jenna Decker. Initial Case Management Order, Order referring case to mediation, and 502(d) order will be entered. (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.. (Lynett, Joseph)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d)) (Lynett, Joseph)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 Errata re #6 Disclosure Statement by FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.. Reason for Correction: correcting name of entity. (Lynett, Joseph)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/9/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jgb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna M. Decker on behalf of FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.. (Decker, Jenna)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC. (Lynett, Joseph) Document removed from public view and docketed at #9 . Modified text on 8/12/2019. (nll)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.. (Lynett, Joseph)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/22/2019. (jgb)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GAYLE LEWANDOWSKI. FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC. served on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Carlson, R.)
July 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC. (nll)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5214546), filed by GAYLE LEWANDOWSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWANDOWSKI v. FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAMILY DOLLAR STORES, INC.
Represented By: Joseph J. Lynett
Represented By: Jenna M. Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAYLE LEWANDOWSKI
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?