BRADY v. REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT BRADY
Defendant: REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC and REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv00881
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Goodrich on behalf of SCOTT BRADY. (Goodrich, William)
August 27, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Suite 10160 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 9/17/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, Confidential Position Letters, and Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 10/3/2019 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/27/2019. (sms)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Michalski, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying Repsol, S.A. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (McCombs, Katelyn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying Repsol, S.A. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION. (McCombs, Katelyn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC Answer due from REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION on 8/26/2019; REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC on 8/26/2019. (Michalski, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn W. McCombs on behalf of REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (McCombs, Katelyn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Hentosz on behalf of REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Hentosz, Brian)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Pritchard on behalf of REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Pritchard, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michalski on behalf of REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC. (Michalski, Christopher)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Eddy, J.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney William R. Liles to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5248315) by SCOTT BRADY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Liles, William )
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SCOTT BRADY. REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019; REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Dunlap, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of SCOTT BRADY. (Dunlap, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/25/2019. (sms)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Burch on behalf of SCOTT BRADY. (Burch, Richard)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jjg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION, REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5217548), filed by SCOTT BRADY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADY v. REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPSOL OIL & GAS USA, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Hentosz
Represented By: Christopher Michalski
Represented By: Robert W. Pritchard
Represented By: Katelyn W. McCombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPSOL ENERGY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION
Represented By: Brian M. Hentosz
Represented By: Christopher Michalski
Represented By: Robert W. Pritchard
Represented By: Katelyn W. McCombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT BRADY
Represented By: Richard J. Burch
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Joshua P. Geist
Represented By: William F. Goodrich
Represented By: William Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?