LOWRY v. SAUL
Plaintiff: WENDY S. LOWRY
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF) and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 2:2019cv00886
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Donetta W Ambrose
Referring Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by WENDY S. LOWRY. ANDREW M. SAUL served on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Bronson, Brian)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL (ma)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by WENDY S. LOWRY. (mao)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 7/26/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (slh)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Donetta W. Ambrose for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/26/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WENDY S. LOWRY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons - Attorney General, #5 Proposed Summons - Commissioner, Social Security Administration, #6 Proposed Summons - US Attorney) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOWRY v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA (INTERESTED PARTY / NEF)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY S. LOWRY
Represented By: Brian Patrick Bronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?