UNGLO v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: GIA UNGLO
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY and STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00892
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service by GIA UNGLO (Kontos, George)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/28/19. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/28/19. (jhi)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Martini, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. In light of Plaintiff's filing of a First Amended Complaint, (Doc. #9 ), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. #4 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall amend the case caption to reflect the sole Defendant in the case is State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, as Plaintiff's Amended Complaint indicates that the parties have stipulated to the removal of all other Defendants. (See Doc. #9 at paras. 3-5.) Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before 9/9/19. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/20/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
August 18, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by GIA UNGLO. (Kontos, George)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gartin, Garth)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Response re #4 Motion to Dismiss. Consistent with the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), Plaintiff's response is due by 8/20/19. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures, and no briefing schedule will issue. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 8/10/19. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/31/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Conferring, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Martini, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Garth A. Gartin on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY, STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gartin, Garth)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b). See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/24/19. (rdl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-19-5808 with Jury demand Copies attached: Complaint, appearance, proof of service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5221289), filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe for writ of summons, #3 Proof of service, #4 Proof of service, #5 Proof of service, #6 Proof of service, #7 Praecipe for appearance, #8 Praecipe to file complaint, #9 Complaint) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNGLO v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark A. Martini
Represented By: Garth A. Gartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark A. Martini
Represented By: Garth A. Gartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY
Represented By: Mark A. Martini
Represented By: Garth A. Gartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Mark A. Martini
Represented By: Garth A. Gartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIA UNGLO
Represented By: Claire McGee
Represented By: George M. Kontos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?