GRAY v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Plaintiff: JAMES F. GRAY
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00894
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Zidian, Chloe)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Chloe C. Zidian on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Zidian, Chloe)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 10/15/2019. Case Management set for 10/17/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/10/2019. (smc)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/9/2019. (smc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (smc)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Claude W. Anderson, Jr on behalf of JAMES F. GRAY. (Anderson, Claude)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Johnston, J.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying Norfolk Southern Corporation; Pocahontas Land Corp.; Thoroughbred Technology & Telecommunications, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Johnston, J.)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Johnston, J.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5222279), filed by JAMES F. GRAY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRAY v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: Chloe C. Zidian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES F. GRAY
Represented By: Henri Marcel
Represented By: Claude W. Anderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?