FOURTH STREET BARBEQUE, INC. v. MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: FOURTH STREET BARBEQUE, INC.
Defendant: MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00902
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Counterclaim by FOURTH STREET BARBEQUE, INC. (Cooney, James) Modified text on 9/19/2019. (jjg)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/27/19. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/27/19. (jhi)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against FOURTH STREET BARBEQUE, INC. by MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Meyers, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/29/19. (jhi)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Fuchs on behalf of FOURTH STREET BARBEQUE, INC.. (Fuchs, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Cooney on behalf of FOURTH STREET BARBEQUE, INC.. (Cooney, James)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number 19-8910 Copies attached: complaint and return of service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5223941), filed by MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOURTH STREET BARBEQUE, INC. v. MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FOURTH STREET BARBEQUE, INC.
Represented By: Robert O. Lampl
Represented By: James R. Cooney
Represented By: David L. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTORISTS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?