GIANT EAGLE, INC. et al v. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: HBC SERVICE COMPANY and GIANT EAGLE, INC.
Defendant: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00904
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion for James S. Buino to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion for Michael M. Marick to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion for Karen M. Dixon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 17, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for attorney James S. Buino to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5286625) by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Buino, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for attorney Michael M. Marick to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5286598) by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Marick, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for attorney Karen M. Dixon to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5286567) by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Karen)
September 12, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (cjo)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Samantha Wenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 12, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Samantha Wenger to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5281332) by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Wenger, Samantha)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Roy Xiao to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for John Grossbart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Keith Moskowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 11, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Roy Xiao to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5280790) by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Xiao, Roy)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for attorney John Grossbart to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5280769) by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Grossbart, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Keith Moskowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5280747) by XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Moskowitz, Keith)
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Dapper, Jr on behalf of XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dapper, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Meyers on behalf of XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GIANT EAGLE, INC. re #1 Complaint, #18 Order, Set Hearings, (Andrews, Tae)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 11/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7C before Judge Arthur J. Schwab. 26(f) Report, Proposed Case Management Order, and ADR Stipulation are due on 11/12/19. Defendants shall file an answer on or before October 1, 2019. Counsel for Plaintiff is hereby directed to immediately serve the Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference together with the Complaint upon Defendants or Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/27/19. (lck)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Leon Sherman on behalf of AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Sherman, C.)
August 21, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that all future motions require a proposed order as an attachment. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Bruce W. McCullough to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/21/19. (ms)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Bruce W. McCullough to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5254134) by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A) (McCullough, Bruce)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GIANT EAGLE, INC., HBC SERVICE COMPANY. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Livingston, Scott)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GIANT EAGLE, INC., HBC SERVICE COMPANY. XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Livingston, Scott)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Tae E. Andrews to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/6/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Bernard P. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/6/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Brian G. Friel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/6/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Tab R. Turano to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/6/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Tae E. Andrews to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5235724) by GIANT EAGLE, INC., HBC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (TX), #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service) (Andrews, Tae)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Bernard P. Bell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5235718) by GIANT EAGLE, INC., HBC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Bell, Bernard)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Brian G. Friel to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5235699) by GIANT EAGLE, INC., HBC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (NJ), #3 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (NY), #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service) (Friel, Brian)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Tab R. Turano to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5235675) by GIANT EAGLE, INC., HBC SERVICE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A -Certificate of Good Standing (DC), #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Turano, Tab)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Errata re #3 Order Reason for Correction: correcting date typo. (ms)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/29/19. (ms)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIANT EAGLE, INC. et al v. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HBC SERVICE COMPANY
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Represented By: Tab R. Turano
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Bernard P. Bell
Represented By: Tae E. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GIANT EAGLE, INC.
Represented By: Scott D. Livingston
Represented By: Tab R. Turano
Represented By: Brian G. Friel
Represented By: Bernard P. Bell
Represented By: Tae E. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Roy Xiao
Represented By: Robert E. Dapper, Jr.
Represented By: Keith Moskowitz
Represented By: Samantha J. Wenger
Represented By: John Grossbart
Represented By: Matthew A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: C. Leon Sherman
Represented By: Michael M. Marick
Represented By: Karen M. Dixon
Represented By: James S. Buino
Represented By: Bruce W. McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?