LARUE v. GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC
Plaintiff: BRIAN KEITH LARUE
Defendant: GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00932
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC. (Gallagher, Clare)
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BRIAN KEITH LARUE. (Winebrake, Peter)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re plaintiff's #14 Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendant's Response and Brief in Opposition due by 10/4/2019. Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/4/19. (njt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 CORRECTIVE ENTRY re #17 Order on Motion to Continue - corrected to reflect the case management conference previously was set for 9/5/19. (mwm)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Continue the Case Management Conference as follows: the case management conference previously set for 9/4/19 is continued until further order of court. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 9/3/19. (mwm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by BRIAN KEITH LARUE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Conboy, G.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support re #14 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by BRIAN KEITH LARUE. (Winebrake, Peter)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by BRIAN KEITH LARUE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Winebrake, Peter)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by BRIAN KEITH LARUE. (Winebrake, Peter)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gallagher, Clare)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re defendant's #9 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response and Brief in Opposition due by 9/9/2019. Defendant's Reply Brief due by 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/8/19. (njt)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC. (Gallagher, Clare)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Gallagher, Clare)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Winebrake on behalf of BRIAN KEITH LARUE. (Winebrake, Peter)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor N. Brailey on behalf of GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC. (Brailey, Taylor)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey C. Kennedy on behalf of GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC. (Kennedy, Lindsey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J. Illar on behalf of GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC. (Illar, Derek)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 9/5/19 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 8/21/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/28/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 8/1/19. (njt)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (njt)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Babcock & Wilcox Construction Co. LLC, Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC. (Gallagher, Clare)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaver County, case number 10859 of 2019 with Jury demand Copies attached: Complaint/return of service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5229488), filed by GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LARUE v. GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN KEITH LARUE
Represented By: G. Timothy Conboy
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT ARROW BUILDERS LLC
Represented By: Clare M. Gallagher
Represented By: Taylor N. Brailey
Represented By: Derek J. Illar
Represented By: Lindsey C. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?