ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, INC. v. D'ONOFRIO'S, INC.
Plaintiff: ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, INC.
Defendant: D'ONOFRIO'S, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00940
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management set for 11/1/2019 at 09:30 AM in Suite 9210 before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 10/18/2019., Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 10/25/2019. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 9/24/2019. (spc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by D'ONOFRIO'S, INC.. (Kwasneski, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Kwasneski on behalf of D'ONOFRIO'S, INC.. (Kwasneski, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C. Kellogg on behalf of D'ONOFRIO'S, INC.. (Kellogg, Sarah)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Epstein on behalf of D'ONOFRIO'S, INC.. (Epstein, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by D'ONOFRIO'S, INC. Answer due from D'ONOFRIO'S, INC. on 9/27/2019. (Kellogg, Sarah)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 COPYRIGHT DOCUMENTS ISSUED. Emailed copy of Transmittal Letter, AO 121 Form, Complaint, Exhibits and Docket Sheet to the Register of Copyrights.. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 docket) (sdp)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to D'ONOFRIO'S, INC. (sdp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 AO 121 NOTICE by ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, INC. re #1 Complaint (sdp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D'ONOFRIO'S, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5231111), filed by ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, INC. v. D'ONOFRIO'S, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADLIFE MARKETING & COMMUNICATIONS COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'ONOFRIO'S, INC.
Represented By: Sarah C. Kellogg
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: John L. Kwasneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?