BIEDA v. CASE NEW HOLLAND INDUSTRIAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS BIEDA
Defendant: LAMB & WEBSTER, INC. and CASE NEW HOLLAND INDUSTRIAL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00967
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER granting #6 Lamb & Webster's Motion to Dismiss Count I and Count II for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/3/2019. (ndf)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LAMB & WEBSTER, INC.. (Murphy, G. Richard)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support of #13 Response to Motion filed by DOUGLAS BIEDA. (Thompson, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DOUGLAS BIEDA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thompson, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DOUGLAS BIEDA. (Thompson, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by CASE NEW HOLLAND INDUSTRIAL, INC.. (Dennison, Kristen)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Response re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Response to Motion due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 08/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 09/03/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 9/3/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 08/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tjw)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by LAMB & WEBSTER, INC.. (Murphy, G. Richard)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LAMB & WEBSTER, INC.. (Murphy, G. Richard)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LAMB & WEBSTER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sale Contract, #3 Proposed Order) (Murphy, G. Richard)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by CASE NEW HOLLAND INDUSTRIAL, INC. (Dennison, Kristen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LAMB & WEBSTER, INC.. (Murphy, G. Richard)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying Case New Holland Industrial, Inc.; CNH Industrial U.S. Holdings Inc.; CNH Industrial N.V. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CASE NEW HOLLAND INDUSTRIAL, INC.. (Dennison, Kristen)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Richard Murphy on behalf of LAMB & WEBSTER, INC.. (Murphy, G. Richard)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Indiana County, case number 11077-CD-2019 Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5237769), filed by CASE NEW HOLLAND INDUSTRIAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIEDA v. CASE NEW HOLLAND INDUSTRIAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMB & WEBSTER, INC.
Represented By: Kenneth T. Newman
Represented By: G. Richard Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASE NEW HOLLAND INDUSTRIAL, INC.
Represented By: Kristen E. Dennison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS BIEDA
Represented By: Brian C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?