MULLEN v. APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Defendant: APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC and APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00996
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8A before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR due by 10/30/2019. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jgb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying Flynn Restaurant Group LP as corporate parent or other affiliate, by APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC. (Betts, Jennifer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC. (Betts, Jennifer)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying Flynn Restaurant Group LP as corporate parent or other affiliate, by APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Betts, Jennifer) Modified text on 9/27/2019. (ept)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Betts, Jennifer)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC Answer due from APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC on 9/25/2019; APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC on 9/25/2019. (Betts, Jennifer)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Carlson, R.)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Carlson, R.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC, APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC (ept)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC, APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5245799), filed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Apple American Group LLC, #3 Summons Apple Pennsylvania LLC) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MULLEN v. APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE PENNSYLVANIA, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE AMERICAN GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?