TAYLOR v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: DONTE TAYLOR
Respondent: ORLANDO HARPER and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01015
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal shall make service of this Order by certified mail, together with a copy of the Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, upon the United States Attorney for the Western District of Pennsylvania and the Attorney General of the United States of America. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within sixty (60) days of this Order, the Respondents shall answer or otherwise respond to the allegations of the Petition. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/4/2019. (sms)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DONTE TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (jm) Modified text on 10/4/2019. (sms)
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by DONTE TAYLOR. Amendment to #7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jm)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: In light of the payment of the $5.00 habeas filing fee (See ECF No. #6 ), Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus was filed at ECF No. #7 . However, Petitioner is still granted leave to file an Amended Petition on or before December 18, 2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DONTE TAYLOR. (cjo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DONTE TAYLOR. (cjo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 24668058465 (cjo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER re #3 Correspondence from Petitioner. Petitioner is advised that the Clerk of Court will not accept an "I.O.U." for payment of the $5.00 habeas filing fee, nor does the Clerk of Court charge interest on a filing fee. Petitioner shall refer to the enclosed Fee Schedule of the Clerk of Court for acceptable methods of payment. However, the Court will construe Petitioner's correspondence as a motion for extension of time to pay the $5.00 habeas filing fee which is GRANTED. Petitioner shall pay the $5.00 habeas filing fee on or before December 18, 2019 or the case may be dismissed without prejudice. Furthermore, Petitioner's #4 Motion for Leave to Amend the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED to the extent that Petitioner may submit an Amended Petition to the Clerk of Court which will not be deemed "filed" until the $5.00 filing fee has been paid. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Amend ( #1 -2) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by DONTE TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cjo) Modified text on 9/19/2019. (bsc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to #2 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, filed by DONTE TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cjo)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner is ordered to pay the $5.00 filing fee on or before September 20, 2019 as more fully set forth in the attached order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/30/2019. (sms)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DONTE TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Accounting Transaction and Balances, #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241, #8 Envelope) (jv) Modified on 8/30/2019 to incorporate "attachments" into Petition. (sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ORLANDO HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DONTE TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?