SCHAFFNIT v. RICO'S RESTAURANT
Plaintiff: SONYA SCHAFFNIT
Defendant: RICO'S RESTAURANT
Case Number: 2:2019cv01041
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SONYA SCHAFFNIT. RICO'S RESTAURANT waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Wallace, Christi)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla N. Presley on behalf of RICO'S RESTAURANT. (Presley, Marla)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 8/19/2019. (bdk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RICO'S RESTAURANT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5251277), filed by SONYA SCHAFFNIT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHAFFNIT v. RICO'S RESTAURANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICO'S RESTAURANT
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONYA SCHAFFNIT
Represented By: Christi M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?