BATCH v. LAURICIA et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BATCH
Defendant: JASON MORGAN, CHRIS FLANIGAN, JOHN PETRUSH, CHRISTOPHER FELICIANI, J. LAZAR and JOSEPH LAURICIA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01046
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, and this order to Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, costs to be advanced by the United States of America. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/3/2019. (sms)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by CHRISTOPHER BATCH. Fee $13.00, receipt number 24668058402. (gmt)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR SERVICE DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff shall provide the Court with proper instructions for service upon each named defendant listed in the Complaint including a U.S. Marshal Form 285, Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (AO Form 398), and Waiver of the Service of Summons (AO Form 399) for each named defendant on or before September 23, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. No extensions will be granted without good cause. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/28/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by CHRISTOPHER BATCH. (ept)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by CHRISTOPHER BATCH. (ept)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against CHRISTOPHER FELICIANI, CHRIS FLANIGAN, JOSEPH LAURICIA, J. LAZAR, JASON MORGAN, JOHN PETRUSH, filed by CHRISTOPHER BATCH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ept)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/26/2019. (sms)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/26/2019. (sms)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTOPHER BATCH. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Authorization by Prisoner, #3 Inmate Account Statement, #4 Envelope) (ept) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/26/2019) (sms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #5 Exhibit) (sms) Modified on 8/26/2019 to separate Exhibit from Complaint. (sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BATCH v. LAURICIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON MORGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS FLANIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN PETRUSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER FELICIANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. LAZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH LAURICIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER BATCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?