MILLER et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Plaintiff: LORETTA MILLER and GUY MILLER
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01052
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MONSANTO COMPANY (mao)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by GUY MILLER, LORETTA MILLER (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Lutz, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 Errata re #1 Complaint amended by GUY MILLER, LORETTA MILLER. Reason for Correction: incorrect civil cover sheet. (Lutz, David)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by GUY MILLER, LORETTA MILLER (Lutz, David)
September 9, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by LORETTA MILLER (Lutz, David)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MONSANTO COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5255146), filed by LORETTA MILLER, GUY MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER et al v. MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONSANTO COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORETTA MILLER
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUY MILLER
Represented By: David L. Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?