STEPHENS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: KARL DOUGLAS STEPHENS
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01053
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT 2 in Support of #1 Complaint by KARL DOUGLAS STEPHENS. (cjo)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBITS in Support of #1 Complaint by KARL DOUGLAS STEPHENS. (ma)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiffs Motion for Marshal Service as attached to his Civil Complaint against Defendant, the United States of America. (ECF No. 1). The Court is only required to order service by the United States Marshal if the plaintiff is authorized to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) under 28 U.S.C. 1915 or as a seaman under 28 U.S.C. 1916. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). A review of the docket indicates that Plaintiff paid the filing fee and is not proceeding under IFP status. Therefore, upon consideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Marshal Service, said Motion is denied. Plaintiff shall serve the Complaint by the means provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/9/2019. (bjl)
August 22, 2019 W/ #1 (last page on document) MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal by KARL DOUGLAS STEPHENS. (jv)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668057939), filed by KARL DOUGLAS STEPHENS. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STEPHENS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL DOUGLAS STEPHENS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?