ANTHONY et al v. JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ERIC ANTHONY and MAYRA TOVAR-LOPEZ
Defendant: COPART, INC., NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY and JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01055
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 Remark: Certified Copy of #19 Order Mailed to Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand. This matter is hereby REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, forthwith. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/18/19. (jms)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mahoney, Sean)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: 1. Pending further Order of Court, no response to pending Motion of Remand #12 shall be filed; 2. Counsel will enter a timeline relative to resolving this case; 3. On or before 9/16/2019, through Sean Mahoney Counsel shall file a stipulation status report considering the attempts to resolve this case; 4. After receipt of the status report, a further Order will issue. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/6/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jgb)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/6/2019. An order to follow. (Court Reporter: none) (jgb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT stipulating to amount of damages by MAYRA TOVAR-LOPEZ. Affiant: MAYRA TOVAR-LOPEZ. (jjg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT stipulating to amount of damages by ERIC ANTHONY. Affiant: ERIC ANTYONY. (jjg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Remand filed by ERIC ANTHONY, MAYRA TOVAR-LOPEZ. (jjg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by ERIC ANTHONY, MAYRA TOVAR-LOPEZ. (jjg)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #7 is GRANTED. Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #10 is GRANTED. Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Complaint is due on or before 10/14/2019. This case is stayed for a period of 30 days. On or before 9/27/2019, Plaintiff shall retain new counsel and a notice of appearance shall be filed. If Plaintiffs have not obtained new counsel by 9/27/2019, Plaintiffs shall notify the Court by filing on the record Plaintiffs' intention to proceed pro se in this matter, and notify the Clerk of Court of their address of record. It is further Ordered Attorney Douglas J. Olcott shall cause this Order to be delivered to Plaintiffs. Attorney Douglas J. Olcott terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/28/2019. (jgb)
August 28, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/4/2019. (ept)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by COPART, INC.. (Ging, Lawrence)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Mahoney on behalf of JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mahoney, Sean)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Errata re #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by ERIC ANTHONY. Reason for Correction: Wrong Document Attached to Original Motion. (Olcott, Douglas)
August 27, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ERROR: First Page of Motion is attached rather than the Proposed Order as listed. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile the Proposed Order, using the Errata event and attach the correct document. (ept)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ERIC ANTHONY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Olcott, Douglas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miller, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COPART, INC.. (Ging, Lawrence)
August 26, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/3/2019. (ept)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce E. Rende on behalf of NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Rende, Bruce)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Miller on behalf of NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Miller, Jennifer)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/23/2019. (jgb)
August 22, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/29/2019. (ept)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-010914 Copies attached: Complaint, Entry of Appearance, Praecipe for Appearance, Exhibit (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5255191), filed by COPART, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit to the cover sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANTHONY et al v. JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC ANTHONY
Represented By: Douglas J. Olcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAYRA TOVAR-LOPEZ
Represented By: Douglas J. Olcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPART, INC.
Represented By: Lawrence E. Ging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jennifer L. Miller
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Sean P. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?