LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC et al v. SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P.
Plaintiff: LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC and SUMMERFIELD WOODS, L.P.
Defendant: SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01098
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Clerk of Court shall mark this CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/04/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC, SUMMERFIELD WOODS, L.P. (Galbraith, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Injunction Hearing by SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions, #3 Proposed Order) (Carfley, Stephanie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Carfley, Stephanie)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions, #4 Affidavit) (Carfley, Stephanie)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 09/05/19 at 10:00 AM is hereby RESCHEDULED for 09/05/19 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Prior to the motion hearing, but no later than 2:00 PM on 09/04/19, the parties must file any witness list or stipulations reached. If the parties temporarily resolve this matter without the need of a hearing, they are directed to contact Chambers via email to Elizabeth_Abbott@pawd.uscourts.gov to cancel. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/03/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Carfley on behalf of SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Carfley, Stephanie)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. A motion hearing re: #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is scheduled for 9/5/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to promptly serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/03/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC, SUMMERFIELD WOODS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Galbraith, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald T. Elliott on behalf of LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC, SUMMERFIELD WOODS, L.P.. (Elliott, Ronald)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC, SUMMERFIELD WOODS, L.P.. (Galbraith, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P. (mao)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5266739), filed by LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC, SUMMERFIELD WOODS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC et al v. SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNOCO PIPELINE L.P.
Represented By: Stephanie Carfley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE ROAD ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Represented By: Robert W. Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMERFIELD WOODS, L.P.
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Represented By: Robert W. Galbraith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?