BURRELL v. 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Plaintiff: TYRONE BURRELL
Defendant: 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01100
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 22 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 01:00 PM in Suite 10160 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/13/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, and Confidential Position Letters due by 11/29/2019 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/15/2019. (sms)
October 11, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Tragone, Adam)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Brad W. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #19 Errata. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 30, 2019 Filing 19 Errata re #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected filing by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. Reason for Correction: Original motion filed under incorrect ECF Filing Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Corrected filing, #2 Proposed Order Corrected filing) (Goldstein, Brad)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER striking #13 Motion for Brad W. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice to be refiled by the attorney seeking admission pro hac vice in accordance with LCvR 83.2.B. Attorney Brad W. Goldstein shall refile his motion using the Errata event in ECF in order to avoid repaying the filing fee. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Eric A. Welter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER dismissing #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as moot in light of the filing of Plaintiff's #15 Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/30/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against 7-ELEVEN, INC. 7-ELEVEN, INC. answer due 10/11/2019, filed by TYRONE BURRELL. (Kobylinski, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for attorney Eric A. Welter to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5296210) by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Welter, Eric)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION for attorney Brad W. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5296081) by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Welter, Eric)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Kobylinski on behalf of TYRONE BURRELL. (Kobylinski, Peter)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Tragone, Adam)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by TYRONE BURRELL. (Kobylinski, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 10/10/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/10/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Brief in Opposition due by 10/10/2019. Reply brief due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/10/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Partial ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Strassburger, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Strassburger, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Partial MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions) (Strassburger, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/3/2019. (sms)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Tragone on behalf of 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Tragone, Adam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying SEJ Asset Management & Investment Co., Seven-Eleven Japan Co., Ltd. and Seven & i Holdings Co., Ltd. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by 7-ELEVEN, INC.. (Strassburger, David)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-7601 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5267156), filed by 7-ELEVEN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURRELL v. 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE BURRELL
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-ELEVEN, INC.
Represented By: David A. Strassburger
Represented By: Adam J. Tragone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?