LEWIS v. FAYETTE EMS et al
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH LEWIS
Defendant: STEVEN RUGG and FAYETTE EMS
Case Number: 2:2019cv01107
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELIZABETH LEWIS. FAYETTE EMS waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Sansone, Joel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELIZABETH LEWIS. STEVEN RUGG waiver sent on 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Sansone, Joel)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Estelle K. McGrath on behalf of STEVEN RUGG. (McGrath, Estelle)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of ELIZABETH LEWIS. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of ELIZABETH LEWIS. (Terzigni, Massimo)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against FAYETTE EMS, STEVEN RUGG, filed by ELIZABETH LEWIS. (Sansone, Joel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FAYETTE EMS, STEVEN RUGG (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5268232), filed by ELIZABETH LEWIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS v. FAYETTE EMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN RUGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAYETTE EMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH LEWIS
Represented By: Joel S. Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?