FENNEL v. CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.
Plaintiff: JASON FENNEL
Defendant: CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01141
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying Vanguard Group Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.. (Choi, Hee Won)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER scheduling Initial Case Management Conference for 12/3/19 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 conference to be held on or before 11/7/19. Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/14/19. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/21/19. (jmc)
October 18, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 7 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorneys advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/25/2019. (jm)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Hee Won Choi to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/17/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (smc)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Elizabeth Bulat Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Chipotle Mexican Grill. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/17/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (smc)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Hee Won Choi to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5313467) by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Choi, Hee Won)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth Bulat Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5313442) by CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Turner, Elizabeth)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JASON FENNEL. CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. waiver sent on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Williams, Susan)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5276336), filed by JASON FENNEL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FENNEL v. CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON FENNEL
Represented By: Susan N. Williams
Represented By: Adam R. Gorzelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHIPOTLE MEXICAN GRILL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?