BANKS v. NPR NEWS MORNING EDITION et al
Petitioner: FREDERICK BANKS
Respondent: ORLANDO HARPER, GINA HOSPEL, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NPR NEWS MORNING EDITION and NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO
Case Number: 2:2019cv01168
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. This case having been transferred-in from another District, it now is subject to dismissal under this Court's vexatious-litigant Orders entered in Civil Action Nos. 15-1400 and 15-1385, as expanded in Criminal Action No. 15-174. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/13/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd) Staff note: On the Court's next business day, a copy of this filing will be sent, via First-Class U.S. Mail, to Petitioner's address of record.
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Western District of Pennsylvania. See Order for details. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 9/8/2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/15/2019. (zmc)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FREDERICK BANKS (zrdj)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FREDERICK BANKS.(zrdj)
July 5, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/5/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BANKS v. NPR NEWS MORNING EDITION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ORLANDO HARPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GINA HOSPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NPR NEWS MORNING EDITION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FREDERICK BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?