DIAMOND v. C R BARD INC., et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. DIAMOND, JR.
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv01170
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER:Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7A before Judge David S. Cercone. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/14/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2019 Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/24/2019. (kly)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/22/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Cyrus T. Frelinghuysen to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc., and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/11/2019. (smc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Cyrus T. Frelinghuysen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5309908) by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C.R. BARD, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Frelinghuysen , #2 Proposed Order) (Frelinghuysen, Cyrus) Modified text on 10/7/2019. (nll)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Order re #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C.R. BARD, INC.. (North, Richard)
September 27, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Richard B. North, Jr. by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C.R. BARD, INC.. (North, Richard)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Feeney, Brian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ERROR: DOCUMENT WAS FILED INCORRECTLY; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Feeney, Brian) Modified text on 9/20/2019. (cel)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Feeney, Brian)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01627. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified text on 9/12/2019. (cel)
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Western District of Pennsylvania via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (MAP)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ)
March 10, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1627-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16632141 filed by William E Diamond, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIAMOND v. C R BARD INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM F. DIAMOND, JR.
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?