HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA v. KNIGHT MOTORS, LP et al
Plaintiff: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA
Defendant: DOMAN AUTO AND MARINE SALES, INC., CHRISTOPHER D. PANTELIS and KNIGHT MOTORS, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv01203
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF COURT. In light of the filing of #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, the Clerk of Court is to mark this CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA (Schwab, John)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF COURT. By October 7, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/23/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 20, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/27/2019. (jm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-011882 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5291750), filed by DOMAN AUTO AND MARINE SALES, INC., CHRISTOPHER D. PANTELIS, KNIGHT MOTORS, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Including Compaint, #3 Exhibit B) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA v. KNIGHT MOTORS, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMAN AUTO AND MARINE SALES, INC.
Represented By: Jason A. Archinaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER D. PANTELIS
Represented By: Jason A. Archinaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KNIGHT MOTORS, LP
Represented By: Jason A. Archinaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA
Represented By: John A. Schwab
Represented By: Jennifer H. Bouriat
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?