LIGONS et al v. WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC.
Plaintiff: CHARLES LIGONS and MONICA LIGONS
Defendant: WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01226
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the initial scheduling conference will be held on December 17, 2019, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 7B, U.S. Post Office and Courthouse Building, 700 Grant Street, Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania. Trial counsel shall attend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/15/2019. (jmb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan: A Telephone Conference was held on 11/15/2019. The parties believe that an Initial Case Management conference would be beneficial. One will be set for Dec. 17, 2019 at 10:30. The Court will discuss at the conference the most optimal timing for the ADR process deadline. (Court Reporter: none) (jmb)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue ADR. The Court will discuss with counsel the optimal timing of the ADR session at the Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/15/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Lenihan, Lisa)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that a Telephone Conference is scheduled for November 15, 2019 at 11:00 AM. All participants shall dial 888-363-4749 and enter the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/12/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Postpone ADR by WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kenyon, Kathryn) Modified text on 11/12/2019. (jm)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 11/07/2019. (jmb)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING the #15 Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 10/07/2019. (jmb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER by WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Kenyon, Kathryn)
November 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added as presiding. (cjo)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER GRANTING Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/31/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Continue ADR. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/24/19. (lck)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. (Kenyon, Kathryn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue /Postpone ADR by WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kenyon, Kathryn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kenyon, Kathryn)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/15/19. (ms)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. (Kenyon, Kathryn)
October 10, 2019 Judge Arthur J. Schwab added as presiding. (cjo)
October 10, 2019 Judge David S. Cercone no longer presiding on case. (cjo)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this action to another member of the Court for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/10/19. (mwm)
October 9, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorneys advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/16/2019. (jm)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Kenyon, Kathryn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn M. Kenyon on behalf of WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. (Kenyon, Kathryn)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell J. Ober, Jr on behalf of WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. (Ober, Russell)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. (cjo)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5296234), filed by CHARLES LIGONS, MONICA LIGONS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Wilson Manufacturing and Design, INC) (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIGONS et al v. WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES LIGONS
Represented By: Daniel S. Schiffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONICA LIGONS
Represented By: Daniel S. Schiffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILSON MANUFACTURING AND DESIGN, INC.
Represented By: Kathryn M. Kenyon
Represented By: Russell J. Ober, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?