SENOVICH v. INVISION HUMAN SERVICES
Plaintiff: GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH
Defendant: INVISION HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2019cv01247
Filed: September 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH. INVISION HUMAN SERVICES waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Bruzzese, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Moreland on behalf of INVISION HUMAN SERVICES. (Moreland, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha A. Gill on behalf of INVISION HUMAN SERVICES. (Gill, Trisha)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/30/19. (jg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
September 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INVISION HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5301230), filed by GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SENOVICH v. INVISION HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INVISION HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Christopher M. Moreland
Represented By: Trisha A. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENEVIEVE P. SENOVICH
Represented By: Michael J. Bruzzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?