AROMANDO v. CVS CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: PATSY AROMANDO, JR.
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY and CVS CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv01249
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CVS PHARMACY, CVS CORPORATION Answer due from All Defendants. (Michalski, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying CVS Health Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY. (Michalski, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michalski on behalf of CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY. (Michalski, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 1/20/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report (attached as Exhibit 1) due by 1/20/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 1/20/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order to the Defendant. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (av)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Case Designation Sheet, Notice served on CVS Pharmacy on 11/8/2019, filed by PATSY AROMANDO, JR. (Ruppert, Sean)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CVS PHARMACY (jd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by PATSY AROMANDO, JR (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ruppert, Sean)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CVS CORPORATION, CVS PHARMACY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5301632), filed by PATSY AROMANDO, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AROMANDO v. CVS CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATSY AROMANDO, JR.
Represented By: Sean L. Ruppert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS PHARMACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?