ANTONUCCI et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Plaintiff: KATHY ANTONUCCI and GERARD ANTONUCCI
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Case Number: 2:2019cv01250
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting #12 Stipulation filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. It is hereby ORDERED that the Stipulation shall be enforceable by the Court. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/15/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION To Enter Into Confidentiality Agreement Regarding Discovery by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Dirlam, Brook)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/4/2019; Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2020 Joinder of Parties due by 2/4/2020 Discovery due by 3/4/2020 Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/5/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/07/19. (dny)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. John Noble is appointed as mediator. Mediation to occur by 1/20/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/7/2019. (av)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2019. (Court Reporter: R. Ford) (av)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brook T. Dirlam on behalf of WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Dirlam, Brook)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Sember Izsak, Rebecca)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sember Izsak, Rebecca)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/4/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/4/2019; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 11/4/2019; Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/10/2019. (av)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Complaint by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Sember Izsak, Rebecca)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying WAL-MART, INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (cel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 19-10846 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5301563), filed by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANTONUCCI et al v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY ANTONUCCI
Represented By: Anthony J. Giannetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERARD ANTONUCCI
Represented By: Anthony J. Giannetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Represented By: Rebecca Sember Izsak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?