MULLEN v. EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Defendant: ESH HOSPITALITY, INC. and EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01254
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ESH HOSPITALITY, INC.. (Leister, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC.. (Leister, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Certificate of Compliance, #7 Certificate of Compliance. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Docket entry re-titled: Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1). This message is for informational purposes only. (nll)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 12/12/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report (Attached as Exhibit 1) due by 12/12/2019; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 12/12/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (av)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) indicating that EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. is an subsidiary by Daniel A. Leister on behalf of ESH HOSPITALITY, INC. (Leister, Daniel) Modified text on 11/5/2019 to correct title of event selected. (nll)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) indicating that ESH HOSPITALITY, INC. is a corp parent by Daniel A. Leister on behalf of EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. (Leister, Daniel) Modified text on 11/5/2019 to correct title of event selected. (nll)
October 28, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 11/4/2019. (cjo)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Leister on behalf of ESH HOSPITALITY, INC., EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. (Leister, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ESH HOSPITALITY, INC., EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. Answer due from ESH HOSPITALITY, INC. on 11/23/2019; EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. on 11/23/2019. (Leister, Daniel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. ESH HOSPITALITY, INC. served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019; EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. served on 10/3/2019, answer due 10/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service as to ESH Hospitality, Inc.) (Carlson, R.)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (av)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ESH HOSPITALITY, INC., EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. (ma)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ESH HOSPITALITY, INC., EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5302690), filed by BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Extended Stay America, #3 Summons ESH Hospitality) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MULLEN v. EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESH HOSPITALITY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXTENDED STAY AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTLEY M. MULLEN, JR.
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?