BADGER v. THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOSIE BADGER
Defendant: DOES 1 TO 5, THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC, SOUTH PARK ASSOCIATES, ROSTRAVER ASSOCIATES, SPRING RUN ASSOCIATES, SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES and MICHAELS MANAGEMENT-AFFORDABLE, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01275
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAELS MANAGEMENT-AFFORDABLE, LLC, SOUTH PARK ASSOCIATES, ROSTRAVER ASSOCIATES, SPRING RUN ASSOCIATES, SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES MICHAELS MANAGEMENT-AFFORDABLE, LLC answer due 12/25/2019; SOUTH PARK ASSOCIATES answer due 12/25/2019; ROSTRAVER ASSOCIATES answer due 12/25/2019; SPRING RUN ASSOCIATES answer due 12/25/2019; SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES answer due 12/25/2019, filed by JOSIE BADGER. (Sweet, Benjamin)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to parties' joint stipulation #9 , Plaintiff shall file her First Amended Complaint no later than 11/25/2019 and Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than 12/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 11/21/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ahm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by JOSIE BADGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed First Amended Complaint)) (Sweet, Benjamin)
October 30, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Motion for Summary Judgment. This message is for informational purposes only. (jm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Order re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for Summary Judgment by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC. (Snethen, Craig) Modified text on 10/30/2019. (jm)
October 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (jm)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule: Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for Summary Judgment #4 due by 11/19/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 10/29/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ahm) Modified text on 10/30/2019. (jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC. (Snethen, Craig)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Motion for Summary Judgment filed by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC. (Snethen, Craig) Modified text on 10/30/2019. (jm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Cheryl Hernandez) (Snethen, Craig). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 10/30/2019 (jm)
October 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOSIE BADGER. THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Sweet, Benjamin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC (jm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 TO 5, THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5309553), filed by JOSIE BADGER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BADGER v. THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSIE BADGER
Represented By: Benjamin J. Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 TO 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MICHAELS ORGANIZATION, LLC
Represented By: Craig W. Snethen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTH PARK ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROSTRAVER ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPRING RUN ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMPSON MANOR ASSOCIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAELS MANAGEMENT-AFFORDABLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?