SPAHN ACCOUNTING, INC. v. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: SPAHN ACCOUNTING, INC.
Defendant: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01310
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Initial Case Management set for 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM is rescheduled for 1/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Suite 10160 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. All other deadlines set forth in the #12 Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/9/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by SPAHN ACCOUNTING, INC.. (Gilardi, Richard)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Kane, Brian)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Suite 10160 before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 12/26/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report, Proposed Case Management Order, ADR Stipulation, Confidential Position Letters, and Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 1/13/2020 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/18/2019. (sms)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Kane, Brian)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing as moot the #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, the Plaintiff having filed an Amended Complaint. Said dismissal is without prejudice to refile as to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kld)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 11/8/2019, filed by SPAHN ACCOUNTING, INC.. (Lomupo, Kevin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 11/25/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/21/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Response to the motion is due by 11/25/2019. Defendant shall file a Reply by 12/9/2019. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/21/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dapper, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement) (Dapper, Robert)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/17/2019. (sms)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S. Kane on behalf of NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Kane, Brian)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (cel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-013062 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5317536), filed by NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPAHN ACCOUNTING, INC. v. NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SPAHN ACCOUNTING, INC.
Represented By: Kevin R. Lomupo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert E. Dapper, Jr.
Represented By: Brian S. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?