HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. STRADER
Plaintiff: HSBC BANK USA and HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Defendant: VANCE STRADER
Case Number: 2:2019cv01313
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 19-3676 for #10 Notice of Appeal, filed by VANCE STRADER. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (tmm3)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER indicating that upon consideration of the Defendant Vance Strader's "Amended Misspelled Claims" and "Demand for reconsideration the district judge acting in an administrative capacity to accept my amended dollar amount am I (sic) claim of $480,000,00," (Docket No. #8 ), which the Court construes as a motion for reconsideration purporting to challenge this Court's Memorandum Order and Judgment of 10/16/19 remanding this case to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, (Docket Nos. #2 , #3 ), as well as the Court's Prior Order of November 14, 2019 dismissing a similar motion, (Docket No. #7 ), it is hereby ordered that Defendant's Motion #8 is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, for the reasons stated in the Court's 11/14/19 Order. (See Docket No. #7 ). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/18/19. (jg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order, by VANCE STRADER. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (mao)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Misspelled Claims by VANCE STRADER (mao) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2019: #1 Exhibit) (mao)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that upon consideration of #6 Amended Complaint/"Demand for reconsideration" filed by VANCE STRADER, which this Court construes as a motion for reconsideration purporting to challenge this Court's Memorandum Order and Judgment of October 16, 2019 remanding this case to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, (Docket Nos. #2 , #3 ),Defendant's Motion #6 is DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction because the Clerk of Court mailed certified copies of the Court's Memorandum Order and Judgment to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County on October 28, 2019, divesting this Court of subject matter jurisdiction over the case and precluding any reconsideration of same (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/14/2019. (bdk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, filed by VANCE STRADER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (mao)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Remark: Certified #3 Judgment Order and Letter sent to Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number MG-18-1494 Copies attached: Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibits 1-5, Exhibit 6: State Court Complaint (), filed by VANCE STRADER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6: State Court Complaint) (cjo)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JUDGMENT indicating that, the Court having issued a Memorandum Order remanding this matter to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, forthwith (See Document No. #2 ), it is hereby ordered that final judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 58. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/16/19. (jg)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that, for the reasons more fully stated within, Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Paueris #1 is granted; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), this matter is remanded to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, forthwith; that the Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed and serve a certified copy of this Order on the Prothonotary for the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, forthwith. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/16/19. (jg)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VANCE STRADER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 State Court Complaint) (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION v. STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANCE STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC BANK USA
Represented By: PETER WAPNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: PETER WAPNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?