CANTWELL v. AECOM C&E, INC. et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS CANTWELL
Defendant: AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10), AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., URS CORPORATION, AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM USA, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. and URS CORPORATION SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2019cv01325
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have an extension up to and including 1/15/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/29/2019. (jgb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AECOM USA, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coles, Amy) Modified text on 11/29/2019. (jmm)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/1/2019. (jgb)
October 30, 2019 Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (mao)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 10/23/2019. (kly) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/23/2019) (kly)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ricky M Guerra on behalf of AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Guerra, Ricky)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by URS CORPORATION, AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM USA, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., URS CORPORATION SERVICES, AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC Answer due from URS CORPORATION on 12/6/2019; AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC on 12/6/2019; AECOM USA, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM CONSULT, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM POWER E&C, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM C&E, INC. on 12/6/2019; URS CORPORATION SERVICES on 12/6/2019; AECOM SERVICES, INC. on 12/6/2019; AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC on 12/6/2019. (Coles, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Coles, Amy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Eddy on behalf of AECOM C&E, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC, AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., AECOM USA, INC., URS CORPORATION, URS CORPORATION SERVICES. (Eddy, Kevin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-011788 with Jury Demand Copies attached: Complaint, Declaration of Kenneth W. Martinez, Cover Sheet and Complaint, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, Declaration of Maymond Boyd Rowles II, Inspection Detail, Docket Sheet, Routers Article, Motion to Conduct Rule 2004 Discovery (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5321244), filed by URS CORPORATION, AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC., AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC., AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC, AECOM USA, INC., AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM CONSULT, INC., AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC., ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10), AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC., AECOM POWER E&C, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., AECOM C&E, INC., URS CORPORATION SERVICES, AECOM SERVICES, INC., AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CANTWELL v. AECOM C&E, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM CONSULT, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM INFRASTRUCTURE, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS CORPORATION
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM TECHNICAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM POWER E&C, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM SPECIAL MISSION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM N&E TECHNICAL SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM C&E, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM USA, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM FIELD SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM SERVICES OF PA, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URS CORPORATION SERVICES
Represented By: Amy Joseph Coles
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Ricky M Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS CANTWELL
Represented By: Brad D. Trust
Represented By: Robert J. Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert J. Fisher, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Bailey
Represented By: David L. Kwass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?