HOUSER v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ROBERT HOUSER
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01336
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Loomis-Gustafson, Carly)
November 25, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Notice of Appearance, #6 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 12/2/2019. (jmm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Shepard on behalf of THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Shepard, Mark)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carly Loomis-Gustafson on behalf of THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Loomis-Gustafson, Carly)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT HOUSER. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Paul, Gregory)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (nll)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ROBERT HOUSER (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Paul, Gregory)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/18/2019. (jgb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5324213), filed by ROBERT HOUSER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOUSER v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mark D. Shepard
Represented By: Carly Loomis-Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT HOUSER
Represented By: Gregory G. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?