LYNCH v. CORNING INCORPORATED
Plaintiff: BONITA LYNCH
Defendant: CORELLE BRANDS, LLC, WORLD KITCHEN, INC., CORNING INCORPORATED and CORELLE BRANDS HOLDING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01337
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CORNING INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Concise Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Declaration of Dana Vallera, #3 Declaration of Jason Reefer) (Hershey, J. Alexander)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for Summary Judgment by CORNING INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hershey, J. Alexander)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time filed by CORNING INCORPORATED; that defendant's response to plaintiff's Amended Complaint is due by 12/6/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plainitff's Amended Complaint by CORNING INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hershey, J. Alexander)
November 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice as to Defendants WORLD KITCHEN, INC., CORELLE BRANDS HOLDING, INC. and CORELLE BRANDS, LLC. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/16/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CORNING INCORPORATED CORNING INCORPORATED answer due 11/29/2019, filed by BONITA LYNCH. (Schiffman, Daniel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BONITA LYNCH (Schiffman, Daniel)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER indicating that, for the reasons stated within, Plaintiff's Motion to Strike #9 is denied; that Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by 11/15/19; and that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #6 is denied, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/1/19. (jg)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #9 Motion to Strike, filed by CORNING INCORPORATED. (Hershey, J. Alexander)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike #6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim: Defendant Corning Incorporated's Response thereto is due 11/1/19. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/25/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim by BONITA LYNCH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Schiffman, Daniel)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON MOTIONS PRACTICE (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/24/19. (jg)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by CORNING INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Dana Vallera) (Hershey, J. Alexander)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim by CORNING INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hershey, J. Alexander)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CORNING INCORPORATED. (Hershey, J. Alexander)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by WORLD KITCHEN, INC., CORELLE BRANDS HOLDING, INC., CORELLE BRANDS, LLC Answer due from WORLD KITCHEN, INC. on 11/26/2019; CORELLE BRANDS HOLDING, INC. on 11/26/2019; CORELLE BRANDS, LLC on 11/26/2019. (Reefer, Jason)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: RULE 12(b) MOTIONS (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 10/18/2019. (bdk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-002095 Copies attached: Praecipe for Writ of Summons, Affidavit of Service, Affidavit of Service II, Affidavit of Service III, Complaint, Notice of Consent to Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5324462), filed by CORNING INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LYNCH v. CORNING INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BONITA LYNCH
Represented By: Daniel S. Schiffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORELLE BRANDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD KITCHEN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORNING INCORPORATED
Represented By: J. Alexander Hershey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORELLE BRANDS HOLDING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?